+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (6)
On October 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 541.
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Manchin under authority of the order of the Senate of 10/14/2022 without amendment. With written report No. 117-190.
On July 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On May 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held.
On February 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
- Introduced in Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor