+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (13)
On January 14, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by President.
- Became Public Law No: 112-281.
On January 2, 2013 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On January 1, 2013 in the House:
- Mrs. Biggert asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
- Committee on Financial Services discharged.
- Considered by unanimous consent.
- On passage Passed without objection.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On December 20, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Insurance, Housing and Community Opportunity.
On December 13, 2012 in the House:
- Received in the House.
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
- Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
On December 12, 2012 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor