+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On December 19, 1974 in the House:
- Conference scheduled in House.
On December 18, 1974 in the Senate:
- Conference scheduled in Senate.
On December 12, 1974 in the House:
- Measure passed House, amended, in lieu of H.R. 17084 .
- Committee on Interstate and Foreign Commerce discharged in House.
On September 25, 1974 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Interstate and Foreign Commerce.
On September 24, 1974 in the Senate:
- Measure passed Senate, amended, roll call #424 .
On September 3, 1974 in the Senate:
- Reported to Senate from the Committee on Labor and Public Welfare with amendment, S. Rept. 93-1133.
On June 5, 1974 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Committee on Labor and Public Welfare.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor