+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On October 27, 1974 in the House:
- Public law 93-492.
- Signed by President.
On October 17, 1974 in the House:
- Measure presented to President.
On October 15, 1974 in the House:
- Cleared for White House
- House agreed to conference report.
On October 10, 1974 in the Senate:
- Senate agreed to conference report.
On October 8, 1974 in the House:
- Conference report filed in House, H. Rept. 93-1452.
On August 21, 1974 in the House:
- Conference scheduled in House.
On August 15, 1974 in the Senate:
- Conference scheduled in Senate.
On August 12, 1974 in the House:
- Measure passed House, amended, in lieu of H.R. 5529 .
On May 21, 1973 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Interstate and Foreign Commerce.
On May 17, 1973 in the Senate:
- Measure passed Senate, amended.
On May 14, 1973 in the Senate:
- Reported to Senate from the Committee on Commerce with amendment, S. Rept. 93-150.
On January 12, 1973 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Committee on Commerce.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor