+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On December 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 115-410.
- Signed by President.
On December 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
On December 19, 2018 in the House:
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by recorded vote (2/3 required): 331 - 28 (Roll no. 445). (text: CR H10309-10312)
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H10319-10320)
- Mr. Banks (IN) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
- At the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Banks (IN) objected to the Yea - Nay vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was considered as withdrawn.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 3530.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H10309-10313)
On December 6, 2018 in the House:
- Held at the desk.
- Received in the House.
On December 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On December 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with amendments by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7291-7298; text of measure as reported: CR S7292-7295; text of measure as passed: CR S7295-7298)
On December 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 707.
- Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Reported by Senator Alexander with amendments. Without written report.
On November 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
On September 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S6389)
+ − Sponsors (24)
Jack Reed
Type:
Primary Sponsor