+ − Summary
+ − Actions (10)
On December 31, 1974 in the House:
- Public law 93-564.
- Signed by President.
On December 19, 1974 in the House:
- Measure presented to President.
On December 17, 1974 in the House:
- Cleared for White House
- Measure passed House.
On December 13, 1974 in the House:
- Reported to House from the Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs, H. Rept. 93-1593.
On August 6, 1974 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs.
On August 5, 1974 in the Senate:
- Measure passed Senate, amended.
On August 1, 1974 in the Senate:
- Reported to Senate from the Committee on Agriculture and Forestry with amendment, S. Rept. 93-1054.
On May 14, 1974 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Committee on Agriculture and Forestry.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor