+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On January 3, 1975 in the House:
- Public law 93-623.
- Signed by President.
On December 24, 1974 in the House:
- Measure presented to President.
On December 18, 1974 in the House:
- Cleared for White House
- House agreed to Senate amendment to House amendment.
On December 17, 1974 in the House:
- Senate agreed to House amendments with an amendment.
On December 13, 1974 in the House:
- Measure passed House, amended, in lieu of H.R. 14266 .
On October 10, 1974 in the Senate:
- Measure passed Senate, amended, roll call #475 .
On October 9, 1974 in the Senate:
- Reported to Senate from the Committee on Commerce with amendment, S. Rept. 93-1257.
On May 13, 1974 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Committee on Commerce.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor