+ − Summary
+ − Actions (16)
On June 13, 1979 in the Senate:
- Public Law 96-20.
- Signed by President.
On June 7, 1979 in the Senate:
- Measure presented to President.
On June 6, 1979 in the Senate:
- Measure enrolled in Senate.
On June 6, 1979 in the House:
- Measure enrolled in House.
On June 5, 1979 in the House:
- Cleared for White House
- Senate agreed to House amendments.
On June 4, 1979 in the House:
- Measure passed House, amended.
- Measure considered in House.
- Measure called up under motion to suspend rules and pass in House.
On May 7, 1979 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Banking, Finance and Urban Affairs.
On May 3, 1979 in the Senate:
- Measure passed Senate, amended.
- Measure considered in Senate.
- Call of calendar in Senate.
On May 1, 1979 in the Senate:
- Reported to Senate from the Committee on Banking, Housing and Urban Affairs with amendment, S. Rept. 96-108.
On February 6, 1979 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Committee on Banking, Housing and Urban Affairs.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor