+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On January 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by President.
On December 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
On December 18, 2020 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7264-7266)
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 3418.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7264-7268)
- Ms. Norton moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
On December 14, 2020 in the House:
- Held at the desk.
- Received in the House.
On December 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On December 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S7370-7372)
- S.Amdt.2697 Amendment SA 2697 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
- S.Amdt.2697 Amendment SA 2697 proposed by Senator Inhofe for Senator Peters. (consideration: CR S7377; text: CR S7370-7372) In the nature of a substitute.
- The committee amendments withdrawn by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S7375-7377)
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S7375-7377)
On August 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 511.
- Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with amendments. With written report No. 116-249.
On March 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On March 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
+ − Amendments (2)
SA 2697
In the nature of a substitute.
S.Amdt.2697
In the nature of a substitute.