+ − Summary
+ − Actions (17)
On June 12, 1990 in the Senate:
- Cloture motion on the bill presented in Senate.
On June 8, 1990 in the Senate:
- S.AMDT.2000 Considered by Senate.
- Considered by Senate.
- S.AMDT.2000 Proposed by Senator Kassebaum. To amend the bill to regulate interstate commerce by providing for uniform standards of liability for harm arising out of general aviation accidents.
On June 6, 1990 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 116.
- Measure laid before Senate by motion.
- S.AMDT.1994 Proposed by Senator Bond. To require the use of child restraint systems on commercial aircraft.
- S.AMDT.1994 Amendment SP 1994 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
- S.AMDT.1995 Proposed by Senator McCain. To grant authority for a Presidential line item veto.
- S.AMDT.1995 Motion to waive the Budget Act with respect to SP 1995 made in Senate.
- S.AMDT.1995 Motion to waive the Budget Act with respect to SP 1995 rejected in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 43-50.
- S.AMDT.1995 SP 1995 ruled out of order by the chair.
On June 12, 1989 in the Senate:
- Committee on Commerce. Reported to Senate by Senator Hollings under the authority of the order of Jun 8, 89 without amendment. With written report No. 101-45. Minority views filed.
- Committee on Commerce. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On May 16, 1989 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee on Aviation. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 101-42.
On March 14, 1989 in the Senate:
On February 2, 1989 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce.
+ − Amendments (3)
S.AMDT.1994
To require the use of child restraint systems on commercial aircraft.
S.AMDT.1995
To grant authority for a Presidential line item veto.
S.AMDT.2000
To amend the bill to regulate interstate commerce by providing for uniform standards of liability for harm arising out of general aviation accidents.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor