+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (27)
On December 12, 1999 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 106-168.
- Signed by President.
On December 1, 1999 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On November 22, 1999 in the House:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On November 19, 1999 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
- Senate agreed to House amendment to the Senate bill by Unanimous Consent.
On November 10, 1999 in the House:
- Message on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendment to Senate bill.
On November 9, 1999 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 335 .
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. McHugh moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
On August 6, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Postal Service.
On August 3, 1999 in the House:
- Received in the House.
- Referred to the House Committee on Government Reform.
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On August 2, 1999 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title by Yea-Nay Vote. 93-0.
- The committee substitute as amended agreed to by Voice Vote.
- S.AMDT.1497 Amendment SP 1497 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
- S.AMDT.1497 Proposed by Senator Collins.
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
On July 1, 1999 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 191.
- Committee on Governmental Affairs. Reported to Senate by Senator Thompson with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and an amendment to the title. With written report No. 106-102 . Additional views filed.
On May 20, 1999 in the Senate:
- Committee on Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
On March 8, 1999 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee on International Security.
On February 3, 1999 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Governmental Affairs.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor