+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On October 13, 2008 in the House:
- Signed by President.
- Became Public Law No: 110-403.
On October 2, 2008 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On September 28, 2008 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: : 381 - 41 .
- Considered as unfinished business.
On September 27, 2008 in the House:
- At the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Conyers objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was withdrawn.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 3325 .
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Conyers moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
On September 26, 2008 in the Senate:
- S.AMDT.5655 Amendment SA 5655 proposed by Senator Leahy. In the nature of a substitute.
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
- The committee amendments were withdrawn by Unanimous Consent.
On September 26, 2008 in the House:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On September 26, 2008 in the Senate:
- S.AMDT.5655 Amendment SA 5655 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
On September 26, 2008 in the House:
- Received in the House.
- Held at the desk.
On September 15, 2008 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 964.
- Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Leahy with amendments. Without written report.
On September 11, 2008 in the Senate:
- Committee on the Judiciary. Ordered to be reported with amendments favorably.
On July 24, 2008 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Amendment
S.AMDT.5655
In the nature of a substitute.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor