+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On October 2, 1978 in the Senate:
- Public Law 95-409.
- Signed by President.
On September 21, 1978 in the Senate:
- Measure presented to President.
- Measure enrolled in Senate.
On September 20, 1978 in the House:
- Measure enrolled in House.
On September 19, 1978 in the House:
- Cleared for White House
- Measure passed House, in lieu of H.R. 9482 .
- Measure considered in House.
- Measure called up by unanimous consent in House.
On August 4, 1978 in the Senate:
- Measure passed Senate, amended.
- Measure considered in Senate.
- Call of calendar in Senate.
On July 31, 1978 in the Senate:
- Reported to Senate from the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition and Forestry with amendment, S. Rept. 95-1053.
On July 10, 1978 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition and Forestry.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor