+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (14)
On June 13, 2012 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 112-132.
- Signed by President.
On June 12, 2012 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On June 8, 2012 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On passage Passed without objection.
- Considered by unanimous consent.
- Committee on Agriculture discharged.
- Mr. Thompson asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
On June 7, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Agriculture.
- Received in the House.
On June 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
- Senate Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry discharged by Unanimous Consent.
On June 4, 2012 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor