+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On December 11, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Commercial and Administrative Law.
On December 1, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Youth and Families.
On November 27, 1995 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from Interior.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Native American and Insular Affairs.
On November 20, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Commerce, Trade, and Hazardous Materials, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Chairman.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Health and Environment, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Chairman.
On November 16, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Resource Conservation, Research and Forestry.
On November 13, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to House Economic and Educational Opportunities
- Referred to House Resources
- Referred to the Committee on Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Economic and Educational Opportunities, Commerce, the Judiciary, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
- Referred to House Commerce
- Referred to House Judiciary
- Referred to House Agriculture
On November 1, 1995 in the House:
- Held at the desk.
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
- Received in the House.
On October 31, 1995 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
- S.AMDT.3040 Amendment SP 3040 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
- S.AMDT.3040 Proposed by Senator Smith for Senator McCain. In the nature of a substitute.
- Measure laid before Senate.
On September 29, 1995 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 196.
- Committee on Indian Affairs. Reported to Senate by Senator McCain without amendment. With written report No. 104-150 .
On March 29, 1995 in the Senate:
- Committee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On February 1, 1995 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Amendment
S.AMDT.3040
In the nature of a substitute.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor