+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On October 26, 1974 in the House:
- Public law 93-473.
- Signed by President.
On October 17, 1974 in the House:
- Measure presented to President.
On October 11, 1974 in the House:
- Cleared for White House
On October 11, 1974 in the Senate:
- Senate agreed to conference report.
On October 9, 1974 in the House:
- House agreed to conference report.
On October 4, 1974 in the House:
- Conference report filed in House, H. Rept. 93-1428.
On September 24, 1974 in the House:
- Conference scheduled in House.
On September 23, 1974 in the Senate:
- Conference scheduled in Senate.
On September 19, 1974 in the House:
- Measure passed House, amended, in lieu of H.R. 16371 .
On September 17, 1974 in the Senate:
- Measure passed Senate, amended.
On September 12, 1974 in the Senate:
- Reported to Senate from the Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs with amendment, S. Rept. 93-1151.
On March 26, 1974 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor