+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On December 22, 2010 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 111-337.
- Signed by President.
On December 17, 2010 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On December 15, 2010 in the House:
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 3199 .
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Pallone moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- Cleared for White House.
On December 8, 2010 in the House:
- Held at the desk.
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
- Received in the House.
On December 7, 2010 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
On December 6, 2010 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 673.
- Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Reported by Senator Harkin with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
On December 1, 2010 in the Senate:
- Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
On April 14, 2010 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor