+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On October 20, 2008 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 110-438.
- Signed by President.
On October 9, 2008 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On October 3, 2008 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: : 411 - 0 .
- Considered as unfinished business.
On October 2, 2008 in the House:
- Received in the House.
- Held at the desk.
- Mr. Conyers moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 3197 .
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
On October 1, 2008 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On September 30, 2008 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
On September 15, 2008 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 963.
- Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Leahy with an amendment. Without written report.
On September 11, 2008 in the Senate:
- Committee on the Judiciary. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably.
On June 25, 2008 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor