+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On November 22, 2000 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 106-535.
- Signed by President.
On November 14, 2000 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On October 27, 2000 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by recorded vote : 379 - 7 .
On October 26, 2000 in the House:
- At the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Ms. Brown objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed until Oct. 27. The point of no quorum was withdrawn.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 3194 .
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. McHugh moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
On October 25, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Government Reform.
- Received in the House.
On October 25, 2000 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On October 24, 2000 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
- Senate Committee on Governmental Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.
On October 12, 2000 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Governmental Affairs.
+ − Vote
October 27, 2000: On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass
- Yeas: 379
- Nays: 7
- Absent: 46
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor