+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On November 22, 2000 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 106-534.
- Signed by President.
On November 14, 2000 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On October 30, 2000 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 3164 .
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Bachus moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
On October 25, 2000 in the House:
- Received in the House.
On October 25, 2000 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On October 25, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to House Commerce
- Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
- Referred to House Judiciary
On October 24, 2000 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
- Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent.
On October 5, 2000 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor