+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On October 11, 1976 in the Senate:
- Public law 94-469.
- Signed by President.
On September 29, 1976 in the Senate:
- Measure presented to President.
- Measure enrolled in Senate.
On September 29, 1976 in the House:
- Measure enrolled in House.
On September 28, 1976 in the House:
- Cleared for White House
On September 28, 1976 in the Senate:
- Senate agreed to conference report, roll call #656 .
On September 28, 1976 in the House:
- House agreed to conference report, roll call #820 .
On September 24, 1976 in the Senate:
- Conference report filed in Senate, S. Rept. 94-1302.
On September 23, 1976 in the House:
- Conference report filed in House, H. Rept. 94-1679.
On August 31, 1976 in the Senate:
- Conference scheduled in Senate.
On August 23, 1976 in the House:
- Conference scheduled in House.
- Measure passed House, amended, in lieu of H.R. 14032 .
- Measure considered in House.
- Measure called up by special rule in House.
On March 29, 1976 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Interstate and Foreign Commerce.
On March 26, 1976 in the Senate:
- Measure passed Senate, amended, roll call #103 .
- Measure considered in Senate.
- Measure called up by unanimous consent in Senate.
On March 16, 1976 in the Senate:
- Reported to Senate from the Committee on Commerce, S. Rept. 94-698.
- Referred to Senate Committee on Commerce.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor