+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On September 26, 1978 in the Senate:
- Public Law 95-386.
- Signed by President.
On September 14, 1978 in the Senate:
- Measure presented to President.
On September 13, 1978 in the Senate:
- Measure enrolled in Senate.
On September 13, 1978 in the House:
- Measure enrolled in House.
On September 12, 1978 in the House:
- Cleared for White House
- Measure passed House.
- Measure considered in House.
- Measure called up by unanimous consent in House.
On August 17, 1978 in the House:
- Reported to House from the Committee on the District of Columbia, H. Rept. 95-1504.
On August 7, 1978 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on the District of Columbia.
On August 4, 1978 in the Senate:
- Measure passed Senate, amended.
- Measure considered in Senate.
- Call of calendar in Senate.
On July 31, 1978 in the Senate:
- Reported to Senate from the Committee on Governmental Affairs with amendment, S. Rept. 95-1051.
On May 19, 1978 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Committee on Governmental Affairs.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor