+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On July 11, 2000 in the House:
- Held at the desk.
- Received in the House.
On July 11, 2000 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On July 10, 2000 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
- S.AMDT.3777 Amendment SA 3777 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
- S.AMDT.3777 Amendment SA 3777 proposed by Senator Warner for Senator Thomas. To clarify that sites for memorials previously approved are not affected by the amendments to the Commemorative Works Act made in title II of the bill, and to make clarifying changes.
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
On April 13, 2000 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 516.
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported to Senate by Senator Murkowski with amendments. With written report No. 106-273 .
On April 5, 2000 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with amendments favorably.
On October 13, 1999 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee on National Parks, Historic Preservation, and Recreation. Hearings held. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 106-383.
On January 27, 1999 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Parks, Preservation and Recreation.
On January 26, 1999 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Amendment
S.AMDT.3777
To clarify that sites for memorials previously approved are not affected by the amendments to the Commemorative Works Act made in title II of the bill, and to make clarifying changes.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor