+ − Summary
+ − Actions (15)
On September 22, 1978 in the Senate:
- Public Law 95-383.
- Signed by President.
On September 12, 1978 in the Senate:
- Measure presented to President.
- Measure enrolled in Senate.
On September 11, 1978 in the House:
- Measure enrolled in House.
On September 8, 1978 in the House:
- Cleared for White House
- Measure passed House.
- Measure considered in House.
- Committee on the Judiciary discharged in House.
On July 20, 1978 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on the Judiciary.
On July 19, 1978 in the Senate:
- Measure passed Senate.
- Measure considered in Senate.
- Call of calendar in Senate.
On July 13, 1978 in the Senate:
- Reported to Senate from the Committee on the Judiciary, S. Rept. 95-984.
On May 19, 1978 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Committee on the Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor