+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On September 26, 1978 in the Senate:
- Signed by President.
- Public Law 95-384.
On September 14, 1978 in the Senate:
- Measure presented to President.
On September 13, 1978 in the Senate:
- Measure enrolled in Senate.
On September 13, 1978 in the House:
- Measure enrolled in House.
On September 12, 1978 in the House:
- Cleared for White House
- House agreed to conference report, roll call #761 .
On September 11, 1978 in the Senate:
- Senate agreed to conference report.
On September 7, 1978 in the House:
- Conference report filed in House, H. Rept. 95-1546.
On August 4, 1978 in the Senate:
- Conference scheduled in Senate.
On August 2, 1978 in the House:
- Measure called up by unanimous consent in House.
- Conference scheduled in House.
- Measure considered in House.
- Measure passed House, amended, in lieu of H. R. 12514 .
On July 26, 1978 in the Senate:
- Measure passed Senate, amended, roll call #254 .
- Measure considered in Senate.
On July 25, 1978 in the Senate:
- Measure considered in Senate.
- Call of calendar in Senate.
On May 15, 1978 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar in Senate.
- Reported to Senate from the Committee on Foreign Relations, S. Rept. 95-841.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor