+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 25, 2011 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 112-11.
- Signed by President.
On April 14, 2011 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On April 12, 2011 in the House:
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 28.
- Mr. Crawford moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
- Reported by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 112-59 .
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 307 .
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
- Considered as unfinished business.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: : 408 - 3, 1 Present .
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On March 16, 2011 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management Discharged.
On February 19, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
On February 18, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
- Received in the House.
On February 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
- Senate Committee on Environment and Public Works discharged by Unanimous Consent.
On February 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor