+ − Summary
+ − Actions (9)
On October 31, 1978 in the House:
- Private Law 95-152.
- Signed by President.
On October 23, 1978 in the House:
- Measure presented to President.
On October 14, 1978 in the House:
- Cleared for White House
- Measure passed House, in lieu of H.R. 12431 .
On September 26, 1978 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on the Judiciary.
On September 25, 1978 in the Senate:
- Measure passed Senate.
On September 22, 1978 in the Senate:
- Reported to Senate from the Committee on the Judiciary, S. Rept. 95-1219.
On May 11, 1978 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Committee on the Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor