+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On September 10, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Workforce Protections.
On July 29, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to House Education and the Workforce
- Referred to House Commerce
- Referred to the Committee on Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
- Received in the House.
On July 27, 1999 in the Senate:
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
- S.AMDT.1368 Proposed by Senator Sessions for Senator McCain. To incorporate a number of changes suggested by the Attorney General, and for other purposes.
- S.AMDT.1368 Amendment SP 1368 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
- S.AMDT.1369 Proposed by Senator Sessions for Senator Reid. To establish contract requirements for broadcasting.
- S.AMDT.1369 Amendment SP 1369 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
- S.AMDT.1370 Proposed by Senator Sessions for Senator Moynihan. To standardize the physical examinations that each boxer must take before each professional boxing match and to require a brain CAT scan every 2 years as a requirement for licensing a boxer.
- S.AMDT.1370 Amendment SP 1370 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
- Passed Senate with amendments by Unanimous Consent.
On June 21, 1999 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 161.
- Committee on Commerce. Reported to Senate by Senator Lott for Senator McCain with amendments. With written report No. 106-83 .
On May 5, 1999 in the Senate:
- Committee on Commerce. Ordered to be reported with amendments favorably.
On April 22, 1999 in the Senate:
- Committee on Commerce. Hearings held.
On January 25, 1999 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Amendments (3)
S.AMDT.1368
To incorporate a number of changes suggested by the Attorney General, and for other purposes.
S.AMDT.1369
To establish contract requirements for broadcasting.
S.AMDT.1370
To standardize the physical examinations that each boxer must take before each professional boxing match and to require a brain CAT scan every 2 years as a requirement for licensing a boxer.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor