+ − Summary
+ − Actions (18)
On October 24, 1990 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 101-456.
- Signed by President.
On October 16, 1990 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
On October 15, 1990 in the Senate:
- Measure Signed in Senate.
On October 10, 1990 in the House:
- On passage Passed without objection.
- Considered by unanimous consent.
- Mr. Anderson asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's table and consider.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- A similar measure H.R. 5595 was laid on the table without objection.
- Cleared for White House.
On October 7, 1990 in the House:
- Held at the desk.
- Received in the House.
On October 7, 1990 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On October 4, 1990 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
On September 26, 1990 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 847.
- Committee on Environment and Public Works. Reported to Senate by Senator Burdick without amendment. Without written report.
On September 25, 1990 in the Senate:
- Committee on Environment and Public Works. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On September 13, 1990 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor