+ − Actions (25)
On October 16, 1981 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 97-63.
- Signed by President.
On October 5, 1981 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
- Measure Signed in Senate.
On October 1, 1981 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
- House Agreed to Conference Report by Yea-Nay Vote: 288 - 112 .
- Called up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
On September 29, 1981 in the Senate:
- Senate agreed to conference report by Voice Vote.
On September 29, 1981 in the House:
- Considered by House Conference Report Vote Postponed.
- Called up by House by Unanimous Consent.
On September 25, 1981 in the House:
- Conference Report 97-252 Filed in House.
On September 17, 1981 in the House:
- Conferees agreed to file conference report.
On August 4, 1981 in the House:
- House Agreed to Request for Conference and Speaker Appointed Conferees: Dingell, Florio, Broyhill.
- House Insisted on its Amendments by Unanimous Consent.
On July 30, 1981 in the House:
- Senate disagreed to House amendments, requested a conference and appointed conferees. Packwood; Pressler; Schmitt; Goldwater; Cannon; Inouye; Exon.
On July 28, 1981 in the House:
- Passed House by Voice Vote.
- Called up by House by Unanimous Consent.
- House Committee on Energy and Commerce Discharged by Unanimous Consent.
On February 18, 1981 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On February 6, 1981 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Commerce, Transportation and Tourism.
On January 29, 1981 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
On January 27, 1981 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed with an amendment by Voice Vote.
- S.UP.AMDT.2 Amendment agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
- S.UP.AMDT.2 Proposed by Senator Pressler. To make certain technical amendments.
- Considered by Senate.
+ − Amendment
S.UP.AMDT.2
To make certain technical amendments.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor