+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On October 10, 1978 in the Senate:
- Public Law 95-447.
- Signed by President.
On September 29, 1978 in the Senate:
- Measure presented to President.
On September 28, 1978 in the Senate:
- Measure enrolled in Senate.
On September 27, 1978 in the House:
- Measure enrolled in House.
On September 26, 1978 in the House:
- Cleared for White House
- Measure passed House, in lieu of H.R. 12728 .
- Measure considered in House.
- Committee on Banking, Finance, and Urban Affairs discharged in House.
On September 6, 1978 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Banking, Finance and Urban Affairs.
On August 22, 1978 in the Senate:
- Measure passed Senate, amended.
- Measure considered in Senate.
- Call of calendar in Senate.
On August 16, 1978 in the Senate:
- Reported to Senate from the Committee on Banking, Housing and Urban Affairs with amendment, S. Rept. 95-1120.
On May 3, 1978 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Committee on Banking, Housing and Urban Affairs.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor