+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (22)
On December 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 115-328.
- Signed by President.
On December 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
On December 11, 2018 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 406 - 3 (Roll no. 429). (text: CR H10054-10055)
- Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H10083-10084)
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 3029.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H10054-10057)
- Mr. Burgess moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
On September 17, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
- Received in the House.
On September 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On September 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S6154-6155)
- The committee substitute as amended agreed to by Unanimous Consent.
- S.Amdt.4016 Amendment SA 4016 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
- S.Amdt.4016 Amendment SA 4016 proposed by Senator Flake for Senator Alexander. (consideration: CR S6154; text: CR S6154) To modify provisions relating to the interagency working group.
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S6153-6155)
On July 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 503.
- Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Reported by Senator Alexander with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
On June 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
On June 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
+ − Amendments (2)
SA 4016
No description has been published. See Text of Amendment as Submitted.
S.Amdt.4016
No description has been published. See Text of Amendment as Submitted.
+ − Sponsors (13)
Lamar Alexander
Type:
Primary Sponsor