+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On December 22, 1980 in the Senate:
- Public Law 96-568.
- Signed by President.
On December 18, 1980 in the Senate:
- Measure presented to President.
- Measure enrolled in Senate.
On December 17, 1980 in the House:
- Measure enrolled in House.
On December 16, 1980 in the House:
- Cleared for White House
- House receded from its amendments.
On December 15, 1980 in the House:
- Senate disagreed to House amendments.
On November 21, 1980 in the House:
- Measure passed House, amended, in lieu of H.R. 6863 .
- Measure considered in House.
- Measure called up by unanimous consent in House.
On September 26, 1980 in the Senate:
- Measure passed Senate, amended.
- Measure considered in Senate.
- Call of calendar in Senate.
On August 6, 1980 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar in Senate.
- Reported to Senate from the Committee on Environment and Public Works, S. Rept. 96-891.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor