+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (10)
On August 2, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks.
On July 27, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Resources.
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
- Received in the House.
On July 26, 2005 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
On March 8, 2005 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 33.
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Domenici with an amendment. With written report No. 109-22 .
On February 16, 2005 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably.
On February 7, 2005 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor