+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (12)
On July 27, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Science.
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
- Received in the House.
On July 26, 1999 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with amendments by Unanimous Consent.
- S.AMDT.1349 Amendment SP 1349 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
- S.AMDT.1349 Proposed by Senator Gorton for Senator Frist. To provide certain technical changes.
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
On July 12, 1999 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 205.
- Committee on Commerce. Reported to Senate by Senator McCain with amendments. With written report No. 106-106 .
On May 5, 1999 in the Senate:
- Committee on Commerce. Ordered to be reported with amendments favorably.
On January 22, 1999 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Amendment
S.AMDT.1349
To provide certain technical changes.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor