+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (10)
On November 15, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans.
On November 14, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
- Received in the House.
On September 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
- Passed Senate with amendments by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S6285)
On September 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 651.
- Committee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator Barrasso with amendments. With written report No. 114-363.
On September 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported with amendments favorably.
On June 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee on Indian Affairs. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 114-401.
On May 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor