+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (23)
On November 7, 2000 in the House:
- Signed by President.
- Presented to President.
On October 30, 2000 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On October 23, 2000 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 2950 .
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Young moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks and Public Lands.
On October 11, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Resources.
On October 6, 2000 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with amendments by Unanimous Consent.
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On October 6, 2000 in the House:
- Received in the House.
On October 5, 2000 in the Senate:
- S.AMDT.4293 Amendment SA 4293 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
- S.AMDT.4293 Amendment SA 4293 proposed by Senator Mack for Senator Thomas. Technical and clarifying corrections.
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 827.
On September 25, 2000 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski with amendments. With written report No. 418.
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with amendments favorably.
On September 20, 2000 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks, Historic Preservation, and Recreation. Hearings held. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 106-901.
On September 14, 2000 in the Senate:
On July 27, 2000 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Amendment
S.AMDT.4293
Technical and clarifying corrections.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor