+ − Summary
+ − Actions (15)
On July 1, 1976 in the Senate:
- Public law 94-336.
- Signed by President.
On June 23, 1976 in the Senate:
- Measure presented to President.
- Measure enrolled in Senate.
On June 23, 1976 in the House:
- Measure enrolled in House.
On June 22, 1976 in the House:
- Cleared for White House
- Measure passed House, in lieu of H.R. 12505 .
- Measure considered in House.
- Committee on House Administration discharged in House.
On April 7, 1976 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on House Administration.
On April 6, 1976 in the Senate:
- Measure passed Senate, amended.
- Measure considered in Senate.
- Call of calendar in Senate.
On April 5, 1976 in the Senate:
- Reported to Senate from the Committee on Rules and Administration with amendment, S. Rept. 94-733.
On February 6, 1976 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Committee on Rules and Administration.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor