+ − Actions (10)
On December 27, 1982 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Oceanography.
On December 18, 1982 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries.
On December 17, 1982 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
- Considered by Senate.
- S.UP.AMDT.1533 Amendment agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
- S.UP.AMDT.1533 Proposed by Senator Stevens for Senator Schmitt. To make technical corrections.
On December 7, 1982 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Regular Orders. Calendar No. 973.
- Committee on Commerce. Reported to Senate by Senator Packwood without amendment. Without written report.
On December 6, 1982 in the Senate:
- Committee on Commerce. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On September 23, 1982 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce.
+ − Amendment
S.UP.AMDT.1533
To make technical corrections.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor