+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On October 13, 1980 in the Senate:
- Public Law 96-444.
- Signed by President.
On October 6, 1980 in the Senate:
- Measure presented to President.
- Measure enrolled in Senate.
On October 3, 1980 in the House:
- Measure enrolled in House.
On October 1, 1980 in the House:
- Cleared for White House
- Senate agreed to House amendments.
- Measure passed House, amended.
- Measure considered in House.
- Measure called up by unanimous consent in House.
On July 22, 1980 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on House Administration.
On July 21, 1980 in the Senate:
- Measure passed Senate.
- Measure considered in Senate.
- Call of calendar in Senate.
On July 2, 1980 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar in Senate.
- Reported to Senate from the Committee on Rules and Administration, S. Rept. 96-844.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor