+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (10)
On May 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Held at the desk.
On May 27, 2022 in the House:
- Received in the House.
On May 25, 2022 in the House:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On May 25, 2022 in the Senate:
On December 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 189.
- Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Peters without amendment. Without written report.
On December 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On October 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
- Introduced in Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor