+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (18)
On December 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 117-321.
- Signed by President.
On December 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
On December 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H9826-9827)
On December 14, 2022 in the House:
- Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 2899.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9826-9828)
- Mr. Nadler moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
On October 21, 2021 in the House:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
- Held at the desk.
- Received in the House.
On October 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S7132)
- Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(text: CR S7132)
- Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7132)
- Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S7132)
On September 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
- Introduced in Senate
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor