+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On June 11, 2008 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 367.
On September 17, 2007 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Bingaman with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 110-169 .
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
On July 25, 2007 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Senate Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 110-73.
On March 20, 2007 in the Senate:
On January 12, 2007 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor