+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (17)
On December 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by President.
- Became Public Law No: 114-270. (TXT | PDF)
On December 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
On December 6, 2016 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7198)
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 2873.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7198-7199)
- Mr. Burgess moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
On November 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- S.Amdt.5110 Amendment SA 5110 proposed by Senator Daines for Senator Alexander. (consideration: CR S6525-6526; text: CR S6525-6526)
- Senate Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions discharged by Unanimous Consent.
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S6525-6526)
On November 29, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
On November 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- S.Amdt.5110 Amendment SA 5110 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 97 - 0. Record Vote Number: 154.
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On November 29, 2016 in the House:
- Received in the House.
On April 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
+ − Amendment
S.Amdt.5110
In the nature of a substitute.
+ − Vote
November 29, 2016: On Passage of the Bill S. 2873
- Yeas: 97
- Absent: 3
Details:
+
−
- Sherrod Brown: yea
- Maria Cantwell: yea
- Benjamin L. Cardin: yea
- Thomas R. Carper: yea
- Robert P. Casey Jr.: yea
- Bob Corker: absent
- Dianne Feinstein: yea
- Orrin G. Hatch: yea
- Amy Klobuchar: yea
- Claire McCaskill: yea
- Robert Menendez: yea
- Bill Nelson: yea
- Bernard Sanders: absent
- Debbie Stabenow: yea
- Jon Tester: yea
- Sheldon Whitehouse: yea
- John Barrasso: yea
- Roger F. Wicker: yea
- Lamar Alexander: yea
- Thad Cochran: yea
- Susan M. Collins: yea
- John Cornyn: yea
- Richard J. Durbin: yea
- Michael B. Enzi: yea
- Lindsey Graham: yea
- James M. Inhofe: yea
- Mitch McConnell: yea
- Jeff Merkley: yea
- Jack Reed: yea
- James E. Risch: yea
- Pat Roberts: yea
- Jeff Sessions: yea
- Jeanne Shaheen: yea
- Tom Udall: yea
- Mark R. Warner: yea
- Kirsten E. Gillibrand: yea
- Al Franken: yea
- Christopher A. Coons: yea
- Joe Manchin III: yea
- Kelly Ayotte: yea
- Tammy Baldwin: yea
- Michael F. Bennet: yea
- Richard Blumenthal: yea
- Roy Blunt: yea
- John Boozman: yea
- Barbara Boxer: yea
- Richard Burr: yea
- Shelley Moore Capito: yea
- Bill Cassidy: yea
- Daniel Coats: yea
- Mike Crapo: yea
- Joe Donnelly: yea
- Jeff Flake: yea
- Cory Gardner: absent
- Chuck Grassley: yea
- Martin Heinrich: yea
- Mazie K. Hirono: yea
- John Hoeven: yea
- Johnny Isakson: yea
- Ron Johnson: yea
- Mark Steven Kirk: yea
- James Lankford: yea
- Patrick J. Leahy: yea
- Mike Lee: yea
- Edward J. Markey: yea
- John McCain: yea
- Barbara A. Mikulski: yea
- Jerry Moran: yea
- Lisa Murkowski: yea
- Christopher Murphy: yea
- Patty Murray: yea
- Rand Paul: yea
- Gary C. Peters: yea
- Rob Portman: yea
- Harry Reid: yea
- Marco Rubio: yea
- Charles E. Schumer: yea
- Tim Scott: yea
- Richard C. Shelby: yea
- John Thune: yea
- Patrick Toomey: yea
- David Vitter: yea
- Ron Wyden: yea
- Dean Heller: yea
- Brian Schatz: yea
- Tom Cotton: yea
- Elizabeth Warren: yea
- Angus S. King Jr.: yea
- Steve Daines: yea
- Heidi Heitkamp: yea
- Deb Fischer: yea
- Ted Cruz: yea
- Tim Kaine: yea
- Cory A. Booker: yea
- Joni Ernst: yea
- David Perdue: yea
- Mike Rounds: yea
- Ben Sasse: yea
- Dan Sullivan: yea
- Thom Tillis: yea
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor