+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On September 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Hearings held.
On September 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 564.
- Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 115-332.
On June 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
On June 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Hearings held.
On May 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.