+ − Summary
+ − Actions (24)
On October 23, 1992 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 102-480.
- Signed by President.
On October 15, 1992 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On October 5, 1992 in the House:
- Message on House action received in Senate.
On October 4, 1992 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. McCloskey moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
On September 23, 1992 in the House:
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Ordered to be Reported.
- Subcommittee on Postal Operations and Services Discharged.
On July 14, 1992 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Postal Operations and Services.
On July 8, 1992 in the House:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
- Referred to the House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
- Received in the House.
On July 2, 1992 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
On June 30, 1992 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 525.
- Committee on Governmental Affairs. Reported to Senate by Senator Glenn without amendment. Without written report.
On June 25, 1992 in the Senate:
- Committee on Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On June 24, 1992 in the Senate:
- Referred to the Committee on Governmental Affairs.
- Senate Committee on Environment and Public Works discharged by Unanimous Consent.
On June 11, 1992 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor