+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (23)
On December 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- By Senator Thune from Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation filed written report. Report No. 114-402.
On July 11, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Seapower and Projection Forces.
On July 7, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans.
On July 5, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
On July 1, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to House Transportation and Infrastructure
- Received in the House.
- Referred to House Armed Services
- Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, Natural Resources, Veterans' Affairs, the Judiciary, and Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
- Referred to House Natural Resources
- Referred to House Veterans' Affairs
- Referred to House Judiciary
- Referred to House Oversight and Government Reform
On June 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On June 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
- S.Amdt.4940 Amendment SA 4940 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
- S.Amdt.4940 Amendment SA 4940 proposed by Senator Sasse for Senator Fischer. (consideration: CR S4769)
- The committee substitute withdrawn by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4769)
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S4752-4769; text of measure as reported in Senate: CR S4752-4769)
On June 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 517.
- Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Thune with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
On April 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
On April 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
+ − Amendment
S.Amdt.4940
In the nature of a substitute.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor