+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On June 3, 2008 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 110-242.
- Signed by President.
On May 23, 2008 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On May 21, 2008 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
- Considered as unfinished business.
On May 19, 2008 in the House:
- Mr. Scott moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 2829 .
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- At the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. King objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was withdrawn.
On April 29, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
- Received in the House.
On April 29, 2008 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On April 28, 2008 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
- Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent.
On April 8, 2008 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor