+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On August 21, 1984 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 98-393.
- Signed by President.
On August 14, 1984 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
On August 13, 1984 in the Senate:
- Measure Signed in Senate.
On August 9, 1984 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
- Passed House by Voice Vote.
- Called up by House by Unanimous Consent.
On August 9, 1984 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
- S.AMDT.3663 Amendment SP 3663 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
- S.AMDT.3663 Proposed by Senator Byrd for Senator Metzenbaum. To designate a Federal Building in Cincinnati, Ohio, as the "John Weld Peck Federal Building".
On August 2, 1984 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 1085.
- Committee on Environment and Public Works. Reported to Senate by Senator Stafford without amendment. Without written report.
- Committee on Environment and Public Works. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On June 28, 1984 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
+ − Amendment
S.AMDT.3663
To designate a Federal Building in Cincinnati, Ohio, as the "John Weld Peck Federal Building".
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor