+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On October 15, 1990 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 101-427.
- Signed by President.
On October 12, 1990 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
- Measure Signed in Senate.
On October 10, 1990 in the House:
- Mr. Anderson asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's table and consider.
- Received in the House.
- Held at the desk.
- Considered by unanimous consent.
- On passage Passed without objection.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- Cleared for White House.
On October 4, 1990 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title by Voice Vote.
- S.AMDT.2928 Amendment SP 2928 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
- S.AMDT.2928 Proposed by Senator Kerry for Senator Burdick. Of a technical nature.
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
On September 26, 1990 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 844.
- Committee on Environment and Public Works. Reported to Senate by Senator Burdick without amendment. Without written report.
On September 25, 1990 in the Senate:
- Committee on Environment and Public Works. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On June 28, 1990 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
+ − Amendment
S.AMDT.2928
Of a technical nature.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor